THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:43:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax-Pickering Palliative Care Team
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: 905-231-3880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vance Tran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tran (CPSO#: 115601 )
Business Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax-Pickering Palliative Care Team
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax-Pickering Palliative Care Team
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: 905-231-3880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vance Tran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tran (CPSO#: 115601 )
Business Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax-Pickering Palliative Care Team
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANCE TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANCE TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018