THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:57:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of General Internal Medicine, Department of Medicine
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
5th floor Fontbonne Building, Room F542
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 x32739
Fax: (905) 521-6068

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arnav Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Agarwal (CPSO#: 115602 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
647-542-9159

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of General Internal Medicine, Department of Medicine
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
5th floor Fontbonne Building, Room F542
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 x32739
Fax: (905) 521-6068

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arnav Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Agarwal (CPSO#: 115602 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
647-542-9159

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARNAV AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARNAV AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018