THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:18:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 McIntosh Drive
MediOne Physicians
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-378-5077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Spadina Road
Unit 8
Skin Pro Wellness Clinic
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M2
Phone: 9052379636
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. AU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Au (CPSO#: 115611 )
Business Address: 1651 Keele St
York ON M6M 3W2
Business Address: 50 McIntosh Drive
Unit 103
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
289-378-5077

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 McIntosh Drive
MediOne Physicians
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-378-5077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Spadina Road
Unit 8
Skin Pro Wellness Clinic
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M2
Phone: 9052379636
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. AU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Au (CPSO#: 115611 )
Business Address: 1651 Keele St
York ON M6M 3W2
Business Address: 50 McIntosh Drive
Unit 103
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
289-378-5077

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA AH QUI AU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA AH QUI AU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018