THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:23:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-270 Purple Creek Rd
Teston Medical Center
Woodbridge ON L4H 5E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-417-2058
Fax: 905-417-1508
Address: 109-275 Gardenbrooke Trail
Gardenbrooke Medical Centre
Brampton ON L6P 4M6
Phone: 905-913-0088
Fax: 905-913-0024
Address: 3300 Rutherford Rd
Unit B6
Concord ON L4K 5Z2
Phone: (905) 303-2229
Fax: (905) 303-0437
Address: Unit 8
8290 Hwy 27
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0S1
Phone: (905) 605-8383
Fax: (905) 303-0437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rushi Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gandhi (CPSO#: 115616 )
Business Address: 3-270 Purple Creek Rd
Teston Medical Center
Woodbridge ON L4H 5E5
905-417-2058
Business Address: 1286 Weston Rd
York ON M6M 4R3
416-242-2850

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-270 Purple Creek Rd
Teston Medical Center
Woodbridge ON L4H 5E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-417-2058
Fax: 905-417-1508
Address: 109-275 Gardenbrooke Trail
Gardenbrooke Medical Centre
Brampton ON L6P 4M6
Phone: 905-913-0088
Fax: 905-913-0024
Address: 3300 Rutherford Rd
Unit B6
Concord ON L4K 5Z2
Phone: (905) 303-2229
Fax: (905) 303-0437
Address: Unit 8
8290 Hwy 27
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0S1
Phone: (905) 605-8383
Fax: (905) 303-0437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rushi Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gandhi (CPSO#: 115616 )
Business Address: 3-270 Purple Creek Rd
Teston Medical Center
Woodbridge ON L4H 5E5
905-417-2058
Business Address: 1286 Weston Rd
York ON M6M 4R3
416-242-2850

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSHI MAYURKUMAR GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSHI MAYURKUMAR GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018