THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 64208
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Enoch Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng (CPSO#: 115623 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 64208
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Enoch Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng (CPSO#: 115623 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENOCH NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENOCH NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018