THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:49:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200B-1105E Kingston Rd
Pickering ON L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-6458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KARISHMA RAMJEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ramjee (CPSO#: 115624 )
Business Address: 200B-1105E Kingston Rd
Pickering ON L1V 1B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200B-1105E Kingston Rd
Pickering ON L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-6458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KARISHMA RAMJEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ramjee (CPSO#: 115624 )
Business Address: 200B-1105E Kingston Rd
Pickering ON L1V 1B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARISHMA RAMJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMJEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARISHMA RAMJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMJEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018