THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:47:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Medical Oncology
Kitchener ON N2G 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3570 King St E
Grand River Hospital - Freeport Campus
Palliative Care
Kitchener ON N2A 2W1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Palliative Care
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Spencer Ler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ler (CPSO#: 115642 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. Spencer Ler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Aug 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Medical Oncology
Kitchener ON N2G 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3570 King St E
Grand River Hospital - Freeport Campus
Palliative Care
Kitchener ON N2A 2W1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Palliative Care
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Spencer Ler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ler (CPSO#: 115642 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. Spencer Ler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Aug 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPENCER LER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPENCER LER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018