THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Front St S
Suite 201
Thorold ON L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-6460
Fax: 905-687-1855
Address: 5017 Victoria Ave
Niagara Falls ON L2E 4C9
Phone: 905-730-5647
Fax: 905-225-1279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Chadwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chadwick (CPSO#: 115651 )
Business Address: 21 Front St S
Suite 201
Thorold ON L2V 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Front St S
Suite 201
Thorold ON L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-6460
Fax: 905-687-1855
Address: 5017 Victoria Ave
Niagara Falls ON L2E 4C9
Phone: 905-730-5647
Fax: 905-225-1279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Chadwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chadwick (CPSO#: 115651 )
Business Address: 21 Front St S
Suite 201
Thorold ON L2V 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH GRACE CHADWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADWICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH GRACE CHADWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADWICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018