THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:41:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
General Internal Medicine
6th floor - McMaster Clinics
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44160
Fax: 905-521-1551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANTHONY SANDRE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sandre (CPSO#: 115688 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
6th Floor - McMaster Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
9055212100 Extn: 44160

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
General Internal Medicine
6th floor - McMaster Clinics
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44160
Fax: 905-521-1551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANTHONY SANDRE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sandre (CPSO#: 115688 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
6th Floor - McMaster Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
9055212100 Extn: 44160

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY ROBERT SANDRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY ROBERT SANDRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018