THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health Care Sites
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 70 King Street East
Heart and Health Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8G 1K2
Phone: +1 289-760-9550
Fax: +1 905-296-3858

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ABULABAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Abulaban Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health Care Sites
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 70 King Street East
Heart and Health Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8G 1K2
Phone: +1 289-760-9550
Fax: +1 905-296-3858

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ABULABAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Abulaban Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULRHMAN ABDULAZIZ A ABULABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABULABAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULRHMAN ABDULAZIZ A ABULABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABULABAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018