THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:58:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HSN Ramsey Lake Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 93 Notre Dame Avenue West
Azilda Ontario P0M 1B0
Phone: (705) 805-6074
Fax: 7058056076
Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: 7058691725
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-36 Elgin St
Sudbury ON P3C 5B4
Phone: 7058063737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2009 Long Lake Rd.
Suite 101
Sudbury ON P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 522-5447
Fax: (705) 522-1797
Address: 1280 Lasalle Blvd,
Sudbury ON P3A 1Y8
Phone: 7052221364
Fax: 7055210729
Address: 80 Elm St
Sudbury ON P3C 1T2
Phone: (705) 806-3737
Fax: 705 806-2985

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig D. Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hamilton (CPSO#: 115734 )
Business Address: 825 Mckinnon Drivew
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
(705) 869-1420
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HSN Ramsey Lake Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 93 Notre Dame Avenue West
Azilda Ontario P0M 1B0
Phone: (705) 805-6074
Fax: 7058056076
Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: 7058691725
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-36 Elgin St
Sudbury ON P3C 5B4
Phone: 7058063737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2009 Long Lake Rd.
Suite 101
Sudbury ON P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 522-5447
Fax: (705) 522-1797
Address: 1280 Lasalle Blvd,
Sudbury ON P3A 1Y8
Phone: 7052221364
Fax: 7055210729
Address: 80 Elm St
Sudbury ON P3C 1T2
Phone: (705) 806-3737
Fax: 705 806-2985

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig D. Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hamilton (CPSO#: 115734 )
Business Address: 825 Mckinnon Drivew
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
(705) 869-1420
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG DOUGLAS HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG DOUGLAS HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018