THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:16:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Stone Rd E
Health & Performance Centre
J.T. Powell Building
2nd Floor
Guelph ON N1G 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-767-5011
Fax: 519-821-4007
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: 5196212330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Dundurn St S
Arthrobiologix
Hamilton ON L8P 4W3
Phone: (289) 389-8181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yeshale Chetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chetty (CPSO#: 115762 )
Business Address: 50 Stone Road East
Guelph Ontario N1G 1Y6
519-902-9374

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Stone Rd E
Health & Performance Centre
J.T. Powell Building
2nd Floor
Guelph ON N1G 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-767-5011
Fax: 519-821-4007
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: 5196212330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Dundurn St S
Arthrobiologix
Hamilton ON L8P 4W3
Phone: (289) 389-8181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yeshale Chetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chetty (CPSO#: 115762 )
Business Address: 50 Stone Road East
Guelph Ontario N1G 1Y6
519-902-9374

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YESHALE CHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHETTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YESHALE CHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHETTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018