THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:27:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: Saifuddin, Tasneem (Used Until: 04 Sep 2018)
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053726811
Extension: 7748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 2100 Stn Main
Saint John Regional Hospital
Saint John NB E2L 4L2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tasneem Hasnain Mehesry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mehesry (CPSO#: 115779 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9

General Information

Former Name: Saifuddin, Tasneem (Used Until: 04 Sep 2018)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053726811
Extension: 7748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 2100 Stn Main
Saint John Regional Hospital
Saint John NB E2L 4L2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tasneem Hasnain Mehesry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mehesry (CPSO#: 115779 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TASNEEM HASNAIN MEHESRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHESRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TASNEEM HASNAIN MEHESRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHESRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2018