THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:16:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 24 Apr 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katelyn Komsa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Komsa (CPSO#: 115815 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
519-254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 24 Apr 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katelyn Komsa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Komsa (CPSO#: 115815 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
519-254-5577

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATELYN MARIE KOMSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATELYN MARIE KOMSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 01 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018