THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:04:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-6000
Extension: 78832
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KENNETH KWONG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kwong (CPSO#: 115818 )
Business Address: 408-85 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-6000
Extension: 78832
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KENNETH KWONG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kwong (CPSO#: 115818 )
Business Address: 408-85 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018