THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 00:25:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 360 4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malhi (CPSO#: 115839 ) Dr. A. Singh (CPSO#: 120368 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
905-494-2120

Corporation Name: Malhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 360 4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malhi (CPSO#: 115839 ) Dr. A. Singh (CPSO#: 120368 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
905-494-2120

Corporation Name: Malhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Nov 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 14 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sukhdeep Singh Malhi may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sukhdeep Singh Malhi may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2018