THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:06:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2333
Fax: (519) 740-4921
Address: 167 Hespeler Rd
Grandview Medical Centre
Cambridge ON N1R 3H7
Phone: 519-623-4200
Fax: 519-623-2546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JASKIRAT GILL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gill (CPSO#: 115844 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2333
Fax: (519) 740-4921
Address: 167 Hespeler Rd
Grandview Medical Centre
Cambridge ON N1R 3H7
Phone: 519-623-4200
Fax: 519-623-2546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JASKIRAT GILL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gill (CPSO#: 115844 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKIRAT GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKIRAT GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018