THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 279 Kingston Road East
unit 5
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163501944
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 102-300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Phone: 4163501944
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hossai Furmli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Furmli (CPSO#: 115855 )
Business Address: 279 Kingston Road East
Clinic
Unit 5
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K5
Business Address: 60 Town Centre Crt
Unit 3
Scarborough ON M1P 0B1
Business Address: 102-300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 279 Kingston Road East
unit 5
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163501944
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 102-300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Phone: 4163501944
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hossai Furmli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Furmli (CPSO#: 115855 )
Business Address: 279 Kingston Road East
Clinic
Unit 5
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K5
Business Address: 60 Town Centre Crt
Unit 3
Scarborough ON M1P 0B1
Business Address: 102-300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOSSAI FURMLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURMLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOSSAI FURMLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURMLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018