THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:48:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Blvd
William Osler Health System - Etobicoke General Hospital
Hospitalist Program
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NAWAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nawar (CPSO#: 115860 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Blvd
William Osler Health System - Etobicoke General Hospital
Hospitalist Program
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NAWAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nawar (CPSO#: 115860 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKHAT NAWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAWAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKHAT NAWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAWAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018