THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:34:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-243 Consumers Rd
Specialized Geriatric Services
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2J 4W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6871
Fax: 416-756-6438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serina Dai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dai (CPSO#: 115864 )
Business Address: 243 Consumers Rd
North York ON M2J 4W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-243 Consumers Rd
Specialized Geriatric Services
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2J 4W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6871
Fax: 416-756-6438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serina Dai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dai (CPSO#: 115864 )
Business Address: 243 Consumers Rd
North York ON M2J 4W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERINA YINGXI DAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERINA YINGXI DAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018