THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:19:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SONDOS ZAYED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zayed (CPSO#: 115871 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SONDOS ZAYED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zayed (CPSO#: 115871 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONDOS ZAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAYED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONDOS ZAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAYED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018