THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:10:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de la Frontera Facultad de Medicina, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Armstrong 3 Room # 16-3-005
Arrhythmia Service
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NEIRA TRONCOSO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Neira Vidal (CPSO#: 115927 ) Dr. P. Troncoso Trujillo (CPSO#: 138605 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad de la Frontera Facultad de Medicina, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Armstrong 3 Room # 16-3-005
Arrhythmia Service
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NEIRA TRONCOSO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Neira Vidal (CPSO#: 115927 ) Dr. P. Troncoso Trujillo (CPSO#: 138605 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Sep 2022
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 30 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. VICTOR MAURICIO NEIRA VIDAL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology at Queen’s University, in which Dr. NEIRA VIDAL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. NEIRA VIDAL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. NEIRA VIDAL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. NEIRA VIDAL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 30 September, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. NEIRA VIDAL's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. VICTOR MAURICIO NEIRA VIDAL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology at Queen’s University, in which Dr. NEIRA VIDAL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. NEIRA VIDAL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. NEIRA VIDAL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. NEIRA VIDAL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 30 September, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. NEIRA VIDAL's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de la Frontera Facultad de Medicina, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018