THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: George Washington University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-2620 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1L 0R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054383777
Fax: 9054352440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hejazifar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hejazifar (CPSO#: 115928 )
Business Address: 1-2620 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1L 0R1
9054383777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: George Washington University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-2620 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1L 0R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054383777
Fax: 9054352440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hejazifar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hejazifar (CPSO#: 115928 )
Business Address: 1-2620 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1L 0R1
9054383777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVID HEJAZIFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEJAZIFAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVID HEJAZIFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEJAZIFAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: George Washington University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018