THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:17:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Freeman Centre for the Advancement of Palliative Care / Department of Family and Community Medicine
Room 3S-375
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: 416-756-6024
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital / Toronto East Health Network
Division of Palliative Care / Department of Family and Community Care
Suite 105
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6464
Fax: 416-469-6164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noam Berlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Berlin (CPSO#: 116018 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Freeman Centre for the Advancement of Palliative Care / Department of Family and Community Medicine
Room 3S-375
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: 416-756-6024
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital / Toronto East Health Network
Division of Palliative Care / Department of Family and Community Care
Suite 105
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6464
Fax: 416-469-6164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noam Berlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Berlin (CPSO#: 116018 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOAM BERLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOAM BERLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018