THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:36:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1896 Avenue Rd
North York ON M5M 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167876060
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1896 Avenue Road
Dermatology
Toronto Ontario M5M 3Z9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30th fl-181 Bay Street
Cleveland Clinic Canada Downtown
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 27 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KELSEY A. ORRELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Orrell (CPSO#: 116022 )
Business Address: 1896 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5M 3Z9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1896 Avenue Rd
North York ON M5M 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167876060
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1896 Avenue Road
Dermatology
Toronto Ontario M5M 3Z9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30th fl-181 Bay Street
Cleveland Clinic Canada Downtown
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 27 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KELSEY A. ORRELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Orrell (CPSO#: 116022 )
Business Address: 1896 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5M 3Z9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELSEY ANNE ORRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORRELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELSEY ANNE ORRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORRELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 21 Sep 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018