THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:07:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3435722670
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ADRIAN AGOSTINO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Agostino (CPSO#: 116026 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3435722670
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ADRIAN AGOSTINO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Agostino (CPSO#: 116026 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN LEE AGOSTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGOSTINO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN LEE AGOSTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGOSTINO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018