THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:34:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Colonel By Dr
Canadian Forces Health Services Centre Ottawa
Ottawa ON K1A 0K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-945-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AILI WANG MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wang (CPSO#: 116041 )
Business Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Colonel By Dr
Canadian Forces Health Services Centre Ottawa
Ottawa ON K1A 0K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-945-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AILI WANG MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wang (CPSO#: 116041 )
Business Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AILI WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AILI WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018