THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:46:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2211 Wesbrook Mall
UBC Hospital
Sleep Disorders Program
Vancouver BC V6T 2B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ARMIN RAHMANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahmani (CPSO#: 116048 )
Business Address: 377 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2211 Wesbrook Mall
UBC Hospital
Sleep Disorders Program
Vancouver BC V6T 2B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ARMIN RAHMANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahmani (CPSO#: 116048 )
Business Address: 377 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARMIN RAHMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARMIN RAHMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018