THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:04:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Critical Care Western
E1-423
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8929
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PRAGER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Prager (CPSO#: 116123 )
Business Address: 2-37 Euclid Ave
London ON N6C 1C2
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Critical Care Western
E1-423
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8929
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PRAGER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Prager (CPSO#: 116123 )
Business Address: 2-37 Euclid Ave
London ON N6C 1C2
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSS THOMAS PRAGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSS THOMAS PRAGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018