THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:57:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 398 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 201-0836
Fax: (416) 259-0184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 28 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: STEPHEN M. WOO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Woo (CPSO#: 116158 )
Business Address: 398 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2R5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 398 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 201-0836
Fax: (416) 259-0184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 28 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: STEPHEN M. WOO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Woo (CPSO#: 116158 )
Business Address: 398 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2R5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN MINJU WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN MINJU WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018