THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:59:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 359 Riverside Drive
Headway Clinic
Unit 105
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-670-2000
Fax: 705-670-2006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 359 Riverside Drive
Headway Clinic
Unit 105
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-670-2000
Fax: 705-670-2006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHIEU LUIGI BUTTAZZONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTAZZONI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHIEU LUIGI BUTTAZZONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTAZZONI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018