THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:16:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076846000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ESA-PEKKA LEINONEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leinonen (CPSO#: 116168 )
Business Address: 96 High Street North
Unit 3315
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 5R3
3435498353

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076846000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ESA-PEKKA LEINONEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leinonen (CPSO#: 116168 )
Business Address: 96 High Street North
Unit 3315
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 5R3
3435498353

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESA-PEKKA JOHANNES ANTTI LEINONEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEINONEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESA-PEKKA JOHANNES ANTTI LEINONEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEINONEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018