THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:31:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 0A4
Phone: 6133543301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Britton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Britton (CPSO#: 116225 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 0A4
Phone: 6133543301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Britton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Britton (CPSO#: 116225 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA ROBERTA BRITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA ROBERTA BRITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018