THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:34:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mogi Das Cruzes, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Rumsey - Cardiac Rehab
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 08 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Campos Gonzaga Carvalho (CPSO#: 116319 )
Business Address: 347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 5200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Mogi Das Cruzes, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Rumsey - Cardiac Rehab
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 08 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Campos Gonzaga Carvalho (CPSO#: 116319 )
Business Address: 347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 5200

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Aug 2022
07 Aug 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 08 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 07 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CAROLINA DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 August, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 07 August, 2029.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CAROLINA DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DE CAMPOS GONZAGA CARVALHO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 August, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 07 August, 2029.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mogi Das Cruzes, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 07 Aug 2029

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018