THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:25:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Hospital
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 873 0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bruyere Hospital
Dept of Care of the Elderly
43 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mallika Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kapur (CPSO#: 116342 )
Business Address: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Hospital
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Hospital
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 873 0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bruyere Hospital
Dept of Care of the Elderly
43 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mallika Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kapur (CPSO#: 116342 )
Business Address: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Hospital
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALLIKA KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALLIKA KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018