THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:00:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St. W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053252201
Extension: 0
Fax: 6476897274
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 416 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Megan Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chang (CPSO#: 116354 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Megan Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St. W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053252201
Extension: 0
Fax: 6476897274
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 416 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Megan Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chang (CPSO#: 116354 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Megan Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MEGAN CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MEGAN CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2018