THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:03:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Division of Diagnostic Radiology
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR ZAFIR SYED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Syed (CPSO#: 116374 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Division of Diagnostic Radiology
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR ZAFIR SYED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Syed (CPSO#: 116374 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAFIR ALI SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAFIR ALI SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018