THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:55:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1568 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-256-4914
Fax: 519-256-4358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Tai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tai (CPSO#: 116383 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1568 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-256-4914
Fax: 519-256-4358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Tai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tai (CPSO#: 116383 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018