THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:46:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Mental Health and Addictions
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
H6
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaustubh Bal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bal (CPSO#: 116606 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Mental Health and Addictions
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
H6
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaustubh Bal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bal (CPSO#: 116606 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAUSTUBH BAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAUSTUBH BAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018