THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 860 Tecumseh Rd E, Suite 104
Windsor ON N8X 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226)526-3991
Fax: (519)945-1771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amin Abu Khatir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 860 Tecumseh Rd E, Suite 104
Windsor ON N8X 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226)526-3991
Fax: (519)945-1771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amin Abu Khatir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIN ABU KHATIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU KHATIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIN ABU KHATIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU KHATIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2018