THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 790 Bay Street
CReATe Fertility
Suite 1100
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JUSTIN TAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tan (CPSO#: 116628 )
Business Address: 790 Bay Street
Ste 1100
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 323-7727

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 790 Bay Street
CReATe Fertility
Suite 1100
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JUSTIN TAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tan (CPSO#: 116628 )
Business Address: 790 Bay Street
Ste 1100
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 323-7727

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN HUAI JIN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN HUAI JIN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2018