THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:20:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. C. Moffatt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Moffatt (CPSO#: 116675 )
Business Address: 1460-70 University Ave
Toronto ON M5J 2M4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. C. Moffatt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Moffatt (CPSO#: 116675 )
Business Address: 1460-70 University Ave
Toronto ON M5J 2M4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CLAIRE VICKERS MOFFATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFATT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CLAIRE VICKERS MOFFATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFATT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018