THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:51:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deirdre Josephine O'Flaherty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. O'Flaherty (CPSO#: 116717 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deirdre Josephine O'Flaherty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. O'Flaherty (CPSO#: 116717 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEIRDRE JOSEPHINE O'FLAHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'FLAHERTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEIRDRE JOSEPHINE O'FLAHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'FLAHERTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2018