THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:31:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: N/A - house calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 2Y1
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: 8887450435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brezar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brezar (CPSO#: 116729 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: N/A - house calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 2Y1
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: 8887450435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brezar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brezar (CPSO#: 116729 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDAR BREZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREZAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDAR BREZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREZAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2018