THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 County Court Blvd
Suite 300
Brampton ON L6W 3W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-243-2780
Fax: 647-243-2782

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Sep 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paramvir Sheri Medicine
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sheri (CPSO#: 116743 )
Business Address: 42 Hall Crescent
Brampton Ontario L6X 3J6
647-243-2780

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 County Court Blvd
Suite 300
Brampton ON L6W 3W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-243-2780
Fax: 647-243-2782

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Sep 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paramvir Sheri Medicine
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sheri (CPSO#: 116743 )
Business Address: 42 Hall Crescent
Brampton Ontario L6X 3J6
647-243-2780

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Jun 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 24 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Paramvir Sheri may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Paramvir Sheri may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jan 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018