THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King's College London (London), 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Green Lane
UNIT 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 764 0188
Fax: 905 764 0189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prabhat Bakshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bakshi (CPSO#: 116765 )
Business Address: Unit 1-3
8 Green Lane
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King's College London (London), 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Green Lane
UNIT 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 764 0188
Fax: 905 764 0189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prabhat Bakshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bakshi (CPSO#: 116765 )
Business Address: Unit 1-3
8 Green Lane
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRABHAT BAKSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKSHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRABHAT BAKSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKSHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King's College London (London), 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2018