THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:11:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen St W
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 32950
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amina Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ali (CPSO#: 116798 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Suite 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 32950

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen St W
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 32950
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amina Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ali (CPSO#: 116798 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Suite 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 32950

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHRA AMINA ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHRA AMINA ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2018