THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:41:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
5th Floor
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272 9700
Fax: (905) 272 1416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alicia Rajwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rajwani (CPSO#: 116800 )
Business Address: 15 Coldwater Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 1Y8

Corporation Name: ALICIA RAJWANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
5th Floor
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272 9700
Fax: (905) 272 1416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alicia Rajwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rajwani (CPSO#: 116800 )
Business Address: 15 Coldwater Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 1Y8

Corporation Name: ALICIA RAJWANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALICIA RAJWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJWANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALICIA RAJWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJWANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2018