THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:43:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thamesview Family Health Team
20 Emma Street
Suite 103
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-5290
Fax: (519) 354-9011
Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Chatham Site
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Wallaceburg Site
Sydenham Campus
325 Margaret Ave
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 2A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Milkovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Milkovic (CPSO#: 116801 )
Business Address: 103-20 Emma St
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
519-354-5290

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thamesview Family Health Team
20 Emma Street
Suite 103
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-5290
Fax: (519) 354-9011
Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Chatham Site
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Wallaceburg Site
Sydenham Campus
325 Margaret Ave
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 2A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Milkovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Milkovic (CPSO#: 116801 )
Business Address: 103-20 Emma St
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
519-354-5290

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON MAXINE MILKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON MAXINE MILKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2018