THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:15:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Henan Medical University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ying Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wang (CPSO#: 116808 )
Business Address: 6633 Highway 7 E, Suite 306
Markham ON L3P 7P2
2895541765

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Henan Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ying Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wang (CPSO#: 116808 )
Business Address: 6633 Highway 7 E, Suite 306
Markham ON L3P 7P2
2895541765

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jan 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 23 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ying Wang may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ying Wang may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Henan Medical University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jan 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2018